Governor-General of the Hierarchy
Selection
Recommendation
Eligibility
Article X, Section 3, Clause 2 of the Constitution sets three qualifications for holding the position of governor-general. To serve, one must:- Have served for a minimum of 35 years with the Hierarchy Armed Forces.
- hold no membership or affiliation to a political party.
- Have no criminal or insubordinate history.
- Under Article X, Section 2, Clause 5, having been impeached, convicted, and disqualified from holding further public office.
- Under Section 4 of the Seventeenth Amendment, no person who swore an oath to support the Constitution, and later rebelled against the Hierarchy or any member nation, is eligible to hold any office. However, this disqualification can be lifted by a two-thirds vote of the Representative Assembly.
Nomination
Election and term of office
Oath of Office
Vacancies and succession
Powers and duties
Residence
List of governors-general
No. | Governor-general
(born–died) |
Dates in office |
Country of origin |
Reason of withdrawal |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 |
(1858 – 1926) |
Apral 19, 1910 – Jonuariic 1, 1920 | Andractiic | Declined to stand for a second election. |
2 | Airre 'Light-Foot' Vazixareinsǫgr (1877 – 1939) |
Jonuariic 1, 1920 – Jun 16, 1939 | Andractiic | Died |
– | Kyn Frømundsǫgr (1872 – 1959) |
Jun 16, 1939 - Jonuariic 1, 1940 | Amadoriic | Served as acting governor-general until Iveer the Fang's election. |
3 | Iveer ‘The Fang’ Vaniisǫgr (1892 – 1977) |
Jonuariic 1, 1940 – Jonuariic 1, 1970 | Corga | Retired |
4 | Vualdetruda Lebuinsǫgr (1920 – 2011) |
Jonuariic 1, 1970 – Jonuariic 1, 2000 | Floniic | Declined to stand for a fourth election. |
5 | Skurfa Airresǫgr (1950 – 2057) |
Jonuariic 1, 2000 – Jonuariic 1, 2015 | Andractiic | resigned |
6 | Aancum Caprakanjóttar (1972 – 2060) |
Jonuariic 1, 2015 – Jonuariic 1, 2032 | Norii'c | resigned |
7 | Guthhere Xavieaxsǫgr (1980 – 2067) |
Jonuariic 1, 2032 – Jonuariic 1, 2050 | Corga | retired |
8 | Atiyeh Maaloufsǫgr (2008 – 2097) |
Jonuariic 1, 2050 – Jonuariic 1, 2074 | Yu'toriic | resigned |
9 | Thaaqib (2015 – 2099) |
Jonuariic 1, 2074 – Meia 18, 2099 | New Viranii | died |
10 | Morgenstern Menningersǫgr (2049 – 2131) |
Jonuariic 1, 2100 – Jonuariic 1, 2126 | Surram | resigned due to illness |
11 | Kiver Kynjóttar (2055 – 2145) |
Jonuariic 1, 2126 – Jun 39, 2145 | Andractiic | died; Assassinated by Härja-Eirǫrðr insurgents |
12 | Shuren Zhengsǫgr (2089 – 2176) |
Jun 39, 2145 – Jonuariic 1, 2160 | Cactiica | resigned |
13 | Arudara Kikerusǫgr (2095 – 2188) |
Jonuariic 1, 2160 - Disimpar 61, 2185 | Mytariic | retired/resigned |
14 | Riccarda Goswinsǫgr (2143 – 2217) |
Jonuariic 1, 2186 - Jonuariic 1, 2206 | Amadoriic | resigned |
15 | Alhfrith Warrersǫgr (2165 – 2223) |
Jonuariic 1, 2206 - Julay 19, 2223 | Meeradoriic | died |
16 | Pekár Matejsǫgr (2158 – 2241) |
Julay 25, 2223 - Jonuariic 1, 2230 | Doractic | retired |
17 | Hjorleif Grimsǫgr (2169 – 2242) |
Jonuariic 1, 2230 - Jonuariic 1, 2240 | Andractiic | Declined to stand for a second election. |
18 | Arn Asesǫgr (2192 – 2276) |
Jonuariic 1, 2240 - Jonuariic 1, 2250 | Corga | Declined to stand for a second election. |
19 | Pinaruti Nashujasǫgr (2198 – 2288) |
Jonuariic 1, 2250 - Jonuariic 1, 2260 | Mytariic | Declined to stand for a second election. |
20 | Taurin Evroultsǫgr (2212 – 2297) |
Jonuariic 1, 2260 - Jonuariic 1, 2270 | Floniic | Declined to stand for a second election. |
21 | Fu Qiangjóttar (2219 – 2299) |
Jonuariic 1, 2270 - Jonuariic 1, 2280 | Cactiica | Declined to stand for a second election. |
22 | Ahau-Chamahez Tzultacajsǫgr (2228 – 2305) |
Jonuariic 1, 2280 - Jonuariic 1, 2300 | Norii'c | Declined to stand for a third election. |
23 | Nino Brunnerjóttar (2240 – 2328) |
Jonuariic 1, 2300 - Jonuariic 1, 2310 | Surram | retired after one term. |
24 | Assa Nahassǫgr (2240 – 2339) |
Jonuariic 1, 2310 - Jonuariic 1, 2320 | Yu'toriic | Declined to stand for a second election. |
25 | Zannax Worefixsǫgr (2262 – 2344) |
Jonuariic 1, 2320 - Jonuariic 1, 2330 | Andractiic | Declined to stand for a second election. |
26 | Khalil Abduljóttar (2277 – 2362) |
Jonuariic 1, 2330 - Jonuariic 1, 2340 | New Viranii | retired after one term. |
27 | Eumer Aednothsǫgr (2290 – 2376) |
Jonuariic 1, 2340 - Jonuariic 1, 2350 | Meeradoriic | Declined to stand for a second election. |
28 | Ingolf Alramsǫgr (2300 – 2379) |
Jonuariic 1, 2350 - Jonuariic 1, 2360 | Amadoriic | Declined to stand for a second election. |
29 | Andrej Hodžajóttar (2303 – 2396) |
Jonuariic 1, 2360 - Jonuariic 1, 2370 | Doractic | Declined to stand for a second election. |
30 | Appius Caristaniussǫgr (2314 – 2399) |
Jonuariic 1, 2370 - Jonuariic 1, 2380 | Corga | Declined to stand for a second election. |
31 | Carius Moniusjóttar (2333 – 2417) |
Jonuariic 1, 2380 - Jonuariic 1, 2400 | Corga | retired after serving two full terms. |
32 | Kitanetos Asijakasǫgr (2370 – 2467) |
Jonuariic 1, 2400 - Jonuariic 1, 2420 | Mytariic | Declined to stand for a second election. |
33 | Tian Zhengsǫgr (2357 – 2441) |
Jonuariic 1, 2420 - Jonuariic 1, 2430 | Cactiica | Declined to stand for a second election. |
34 | Laurentius Jitussǫgr (2388 – 2468) |
Jonuariic 1, 2430 - Jonuariic 1, 2450 | Corga | Declined to stand for a third election. |
35 | Sadara Thigarujóttar (2403 – 2492) |
Jonuariic 1, 2450 - Jonuariic 1, 2480 | Yu'toriic | retired after three full terms. |
36 | Ulfrik Iron Eye (2401 – 2497) |
Jonuariic 1, 2480 - Aogus 41, 2497 | Andractiic | died of old age during his second term. |
37 | Liut Thormarsǫgr (2443 – 2527) |
Aogus 42, 2497 - Jonuariic 1, 2500 | Andractiic | Resigned, declined to stand for an election. |
38 | Enurchus Lebuinsǫgr (2465 – 2554) |
Jonuariic 1, 2500 - Jonuariic 1, 2540 | Floniic | Declined to stand for a fifth election. |
39 | Aancum Kawilsǫgr (2475 – 2578) |
Jonuariic 1, 2540 - Jonuariic 1, 2570 | Norii'c | Declined to stand for a fourth election. |
40 | Ghassaan Ridwaansǫgr (2500 – 2598) |
Jonuariic 1, 2570 - Novimpar 37, 2598 | New Viranii | Assassinated while serving a third term. |
– | Aron Giselhersǫgr (2556 – 2637) |
Novimpar 40, 2598 - Jonuariic 1, 2600 | Amadoriic | Served as acting governor-general until Čiernik's election. |
41 | Čiernik Bartošsǫgr (2560 – 2659) |
Jonuariic 1, 2600 – Jonuariic 1, 2630 | Doractic | Declined to stand for a fourth election. |
42 | Jan Kolleksǫgr (2576 – 2688) |
Jonuariic 1, 2630 – Jonuariic 1, 2640 | Surram | Retired after one full term. |
43 | Chafer Mearcredsǫgr (2588 – 2666) |
Jonuariic 1, 2640 – Jonuariic 1, 2650 | Meeradoriic | Retired after one full term. |
44 | Censorinus Wentorsǫgr (2595 – 2689) |
Jonuariic 1, 2650 – Jonuariic 1, 2660 | Corga | Retired after one full term. |
45 | Peng Yusǫgr (2602 – 2698) |
Jonuariic 1, 2660 – Jonuariic 1, 2670 | Cactiica | Retired after one full term. |
46 | Kakra Samirjóttar (b. 2635) |
Jonuariic 1, 2670 – Jonuariic 1, 2680 | Yu'toriic | Retired after one full term. |
47 | Ariadnh Didikasejóttar (b. 2645) |
Jonuariic 1, 2680 – Jonuariic 1, 2700 | Mytariic | Retired after two full terms. |
48 | Kaplan Arronsǫgr (2640 – 2716) |
Jonuariic 1, 2700 – Jonuariic 1, 2710 | Surram | Declined to stand for a second election. |
49 | Sacherather Kyrjóttar (b. 2655) |
Jonuariic 1, 2710 – Jonuariic 1, 2720 | Andractiic | Declined to stand for a second election. |
50 |
(b. 2655) |
Jonuariic 1, 2720 – Incumbent | Corga |
Governor-General of the Hierarchy
Incumbent
since Jonuariic 1, 2720
His Excellency (informal)
Sir (formal)
Governor-General (diplomatic)
Member ofResidence Governor-General's Longhouse
Seat Hagis, Corga
Recommended by previous Governor-General
Nominator Security Council
Appointer Representative Assembly
Term limit No limit
Term length 10 years; repeatable with a 2/3 majority vote in the Representative Assembly
Constituting instrument Constitution of the Hierarchy
Formation Apral 19, 1910
First holder Ithin Sakdarsǫgr
Salary ð285,500 per year
Intriguing and informative highly detailed article. Thank you so much for entering this article category! Quite an interesting read. If you would like me to feature it on one of my reading streams, please feel free to drop by my Twitch channel anytime I'm live and let me know you're watching. (check the schedule here). God bless and much success with your future plans! <3
Check the latest in the wonderful world of WILLOWISP...
Find out what I'm up to...
Support my creative efforts <3